|
|||
2010-02-01 16:32:35 CET 2010-02-01 16:33:24 CET REGULATED INFORMATION Finnair Oyj - Company AnnouncementPROPOSALS OF THE SHAREHOLDERS' NOMINATION COMMITTEE ON THE COMPOSITION AND REMUNERATION OF THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF FINNAIR PLCFINNAIR PLC STOCK EXCHANGE RELEASE 1.2.2010 17:30 The Shareholders' Nomination Committee has decided to propose to the 2010 Annual General Meeting of Finnair Plc that the number of members of the Board of Directors would be confirmed eight, and that Christoffer Taxell, Elina Björklund, Sigurður Helgason, Satu Huber, Ursula Ranin, Veli Sundbäck and Pekka Timonen of the current members would be re-elected. Mr. Kari Jordan has advised that he will not stand as a candidate for 2010. The Committee proposes that he would be replaced by Mr. Harri Sailas. The Committee further proposes that Christoffer Taxell would be elected as the Chairman of the Board of Directors. The Committee also proposes to the 2010 Annual General Meeting that the remunerations of the members of the Board of Directors would remain unchanged. The current remunerations are: - the Chairman 61,200 Euros per year - the Vice Chairman 32,400 Euros per year - the other members 30,000 Euros per year - to a member residing in Finland 600 Euros and to a member residing abroad 1,200 Euros per meeting of the Board or its Committee. The above proposals will be included in the notice to convene the Annual General Meeting that will be published later. Attached is the CV of Harri Sailas. The CVs of the other proposed board members can be found on the internet at http://www.finnair.com/group. The representatives of the three largest shareholders of Finnair as of 2 November 2009 formed the Shareholders' Nomination Committee of the company. The members of the Committee were Jarmo Väisänen, Senior Financial Counsellor, Prime Minister's Office (State of Finland), Timo Viherkenttä, Deputy Chief Executive Officer (The Local Government Pensions Institution ) and Michael Gobitschek (Skagen Global Verdipapirfond). The Chairman of Finnair's Board, Christoffer Taxell and the Vice Chairman of the Finnair's Board, Kari Jordan served as expert members of the Committee. For further information, please contact: Jarmo Väisänen, Senior Financial Counsellor, Prime Minister's Office, Chairman of the Shareholders' Nomination Committee, tel +358 9 1602 3015. Finnair Plc Communications 1.2.2010 CURRICULUM VITAE Harri Sailas Born: 1951 Education: M.Sc. Econ. & Bus. Adm. Current position: The Chief Executive Officer, Ilmarinen Mutual Pension Insurance Company, since 2007. Served with Ilmarinen since 2006. Harri Sailas has a long career in various management positions in Nordea Bank as well as its predecessors Merita and KOP Bank in 1975-2006. Other positions: The Chairman of the Board in The Helsinki Region Chamber of Commerce, The Finnish Pension Alliance TELA and Aalto University Real Estates; the Chairman of the Committee for Economic Policy in The Central Chamber of Commerce of Finland; the Member of the Confederation of Finnish Industries EK's delegation and the Member of the Supervisory Board of OP-Keskus. |
|||
|