|
|||
2009-09-14 08:00:00 CEST 2009-09-14 08:21:47 CEST REGULATED INFORMATION Vacon - Changes board/management/auditorsNew CFO for Vacon PlcVacon Plc, Stock Exchange Release, 14 September 2009 at 9.00 am: Eriikka Söderström, MSc. Econ. (born 1968),has been appointed Chief Financial Officer of Vacon Plc and member of the company's Management Team as from 15 September 2009. Eriikka Söderström has previously held several positions in finance and control at Nokia Networks including acting as the Business Group Controller and having the corporate controller position at Nokia Siemens Networks. Most recently she worked as the Chief Financial Officer at Oy Nautor Ab. Mika Leppänen, MSc. Econ., who has been CFO at Vacon Plc and a member of the Management Team, has resigned from the company and has been released from his duties as CFO. Vacon in brief Vacon's operations are driven by a passion to develop, manufacture and sell the best AC drives in the world - and nothing else. AC drives are used to control electric motors and in renewable energy generation. Vacon has R&D and production units in Finland, the USA, China and Italy, and sales offices in more than 25 countries. In 2008 Vacon had revenues of EUR 293.2 million and globally employed 1200 people. The shares of Vacon Plc (VAC1V) are quoted on the main list of the Helsinki stock exchange Driven by Drives, www.vacon.com Vacon Plc Board of Directors For more information, please contact: Vesa Laisi, President and CEO, tel: +358 (0)40 8371 510 Distribution: NASDAQ OMX Helsinki Main media Financial Supervision Authority |
|||
|