|
|||
2009-10-07 08:05:00 CEST 2009-10-07 08:05:01 CEST REGULATED INFORMATION Marimekko - Changes board/management/auditorsCHANGES IN MARIMEKKO'S MANAGEMENTMarimekko Corporation STOCK EXCHANGE RELEASE 7 October 2009 at 9.05 a.m. CHANGES IN MARIMEKKO'S MANAGEMENT Marimekko Corporation's Sales Director and member of the Management Group, Mervi Metsänen-Kalliovaara, leaves the company on 7 October 2009. Her resignation was agreed through mutual consensus. Her duties will be re-allocated internally by implementing a leaner organisational structure. Marimekko Corporation's Sales Manager, Heidi Lihr, 40, will assume responsibility for the company's domestic wholesale business as of 7 October 2009. She joined the company on 6 August 2007. From 7 October 2009, the Marimekko Group's Management Group will be composed of Mika Ihamuotila as Chairman, with members Thomas Ekström (finance, control and investor relations), Malin Groop (marketing) Päivi Lonka (international sales), Niina Nenonen (clothing, bags and accessories), Piia Rossi (company-owned retail stores), and Helinä Uotila (production, purchases, and interior decoration). MARIMEKKO CORPORATION Group Communications Piia Pakarinen Tel. +358 9 758 7293 Fax +358 9 755 3051 Email: piia.pakarinen@marimekko.fi Distribution: NASDAQ OMX Helsinki Principal media Marimekko's website www.marimekko.com Marimekko, established in 1951, is a leading Finnish textile and clothing design company renowned for its original prints and colours. The company designs and manufactures high-quality clothing, interior decoration textiles, bags and other accessories. Marimekko products are sold in over 40 countries. Products with Marimekko designs are also manufactured under licence in various countries. In 2008, the company's net sales amounted to EUR 81.1 million. Exports and international operations accounted for 27.0% of the Group's net sales. The Group employs about 410 people. The company's share is quoted on the NASDAQ OMX Helsinki Ltd. |
|||
|