|
|||
2011-02-24 16:00:00 CET 2011-02-24 16:00:02 CET REGULATED INFORMATION DnB NORD Bankas AB - Notification on material eventRegarding changes in the Supervisory CouncilAB DnB NORD Bankas, company code 112029270, VAT payer code LT120292716, registered office at J. Basanavičiaus St. 26, Vilnius, the data is collected and stored at the Register of Legal Entities, notifies that on 28 February 2011 the chairman of the Supervisory Council Thomas Stephan Buerkle and the member of the Supervisory Council Andris Ozolins resign from these positions. By the decision of the sole shareholder of AB DnB NORD Bankas - Bank DnB NORD A/S, Terje Turnes, Head of the Baltic and Poland Division of Norway‘s DnB NOR A/S bank is elected to the Supervisory Council of the Bank from 1 March 2011 until expiry of the term of office of the current Supervisory Council. Terje Turnes (born 1963) has been working at DnB NOR bank since 1989. Prior to taking the job of the Head of Baltic and Poland Division, he was the head of DnB NOR's office in London. Terje Turnes holds diplomas in economics, administration and marketing. Terje Turnes, Thomas Stepan Buerkle and Andris Ozolins have no shares in AB DnB NORD Bankas. Andrius Vilkancas Press officer tel. +370 5 239 3413 |
|||
|