|
|||
2009-11-02 16:00:00 CET 2009-11-02 16:00:01 CET REGULATED INFORMATION Tiimari Oyj Abp - Changes board/management/auditorsArja Hautanen resigned from Tiimari's board of directors and focuses on the operations of her own family businessTIIMARI PLC STOCK EXCHANGE RELEASE 2 NOVEMBER 2009 at 17.00 ARJA HAUTANEN RESIGNED FROM TIIMARI'S BOARD OF DIRECTORS AND FOCUSES ON THE OPERATIONS OF HER FAMILY BUSINESS Arja Hautanen, who has been a member of Tiimari's board of directors from 2006 handed in her resignation from the Board on 2nd November 2009. Arja Hautanen: “We are expanding the operations in our family business and opening among others our own Outlet-shop in the beginning of 2010. I do want to develop the operations in our own business in the future and focus on making a result over there. I acknowledge that, as my duties increase I cannot continue serving as a board member at Tiimari Plc due to a lack of time. I wish Tiimari Plc and its personnel continued success now and in the future.” Tiimari Plc would like to thank Arja Hautanen for her efforts for the benefit of the company and wish her success in the new business venture. Tiimari Plc Board of Directors Distribution: NASDAQ OMX Helsinki important news media www.tiimari.com Further information: CEO Hannu Krook tel. + 358 (0)3 812911, e-mail hannu.krook@tiimari.fi Tiimari Plc shares are listed at Nasdaq OMX Helsinki Plc. The Group comprises two retail shop concepts, Tiimari and Gallerix. The concepts operate nearly 300 shops in seven countries within the Baltic Sea region. Both concepts belong to the forerunners within their business segments. |
|||
|